HI SB300 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB300
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the chairperson of the board of agriculture to develop and implement a bioengineered food disclosure standard, in a manner identical with regulations adopted pursuant to the federal National Bioengineered Food Disclosure Standard, P.L. No. 114-216. Specifies options for disclosure. Effective 01/01/2018.
Title
Relating To Disclosures For Bioengineered Food.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB300 (Carry Over) 2017-01-25 - Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=300&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB300_.HTM |