HI SB3000 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - (S) The committee(s) on ENE/EDT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-12 3:00PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - (S) The committee(s) on ENE/EDT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-12 3:00PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes a high-voltage electric transmission cable system for interisland transmission of electricity in the definition of "public utility", regardless of whether the electricity is generated using nonfossil fuels, provided that the PUC finds that regulation is in the public interest.
Title
Public Utilities; High-Voltage Electric Transmission Cable System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/EDT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-12 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 3:00PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to ENE/EDT, CPN. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3000 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB3000_.HTM |