HI SB304 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the interest earned on the balance of the Hawaii hurricane reserve trust fund to be retained in the trust fund. Requires the board of directors of the Hawaii Hurricane Relief fund to conduct a study of the acquisition of a catastrophic hurricane loss financing arrangement with all or a portion of the interest earned in the trust fund. Appropriates hurricane reserve trust fund moneys for the study. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 490) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB304 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund
Interest Earned, Catastrophic Loss Financing Arrangement Study
Hawaii Hurricane Relief Fund
Interest Earned, Catastrophic Loss Financing Arrangement Study