HI SB3044 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the transitional energy working group within DBEDT to lay the foundation for future renewable energy development that transitions the State away from fossil fuels and to one hundred per cent clean electricity in general, beginning with the transportation sector. Requires a report to the Legislature. (SD1)
Title
Transitional Energy Working Group
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from TRE/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2477) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Gabbard, Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Nishihara. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-16 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to TRE/EET, WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2085 (Same As) 2016-03-15 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.