HI SB3045 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to CPH/TRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to CPH/TRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits electric utility companies from recovering costs from the customer base for the purchase of coal beginning January 1, 2023. Prohibits power purchase agreements from being approved by the public utilities commission if the agreement is for the purchase of coal for the generation of electricity occurring after December 31, 2022.
Title
Energy; Public Utilities Commission; Electric Utility Companies; Purchase of Coal for Power Generation
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPH/TRE, WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3045&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB3045_.HTM |