HI SB3047 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies the exemption from environmental impact statements for affordable housing projects that meet certain criteria. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Impact Statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HOU/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2520) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hashimoto, Aquino. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/AEN deferred the measure until 02-12-24 1:01PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 1:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HOU/AEN, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2358 (Same As) 2024-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.