HI SB3071 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Land and Natural Resources to engage in negotiations to acquire the makai lands of Kapua, island of Hawaii. Authorizes the acquisition to be made through the purchase, sale, or exchange of other real property. Allows the Department of Land and Natural Resources to report to the Legislature in writing on the status of the negotiations beginning July 1, 2016, and every three months thereafter. Provides that the Department of Land and Natural Resources shall attempt to reach an agreement for the acquisition by December 31, 2016; provided that if an agreement is not reached by that date negotiations may continue and the Department shall continue to provide quarterly progress reports. Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources to conduct due diligence on the makai lands of Kapua and for negotiations to acquire those lands. (SB3071 HD2)
Title
DLNR; Makai Lands of Kapua; Land Acquisition; Real Property; Negotiation; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628). |
2016-04-25 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Luke replaced Representative(s) Cullen as Co-Chairs. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Gabbard Co-Chair; Galuteria, K.Kahele, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 603). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1698-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-07-16 2:01PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3). |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1176-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Pouha. |
2016-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-18-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 14 |
2016-02-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 9) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Deferred until 02-09-16. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-08-16. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2037) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |