HI SB3094 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation for a department of education virtual school and authorizes the director of finance to issue general obligation bonds. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Making An Emergency Appropriation To The Department Of Education For A Virtual School.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Eli Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 563). |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1877-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, McDermott. |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Governor re: Recommended for Immediate Passage (Gov. Msg. No. 17). |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Clark, Quinlan, Yamane. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 42) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Nishihara). Transmitted to House. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-22. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2712) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2138) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 + videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2126 (Same As) 2022-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).