HI SB3130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows any cemetery authority to be exempted from licensing, bonding, and fee requirements when selling or offering use of its property or portion thereof for the inurnment of cremated remains of its members, adherents, and their families.
Title
Relating To Cemeteries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2202 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3130&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB3130_.HTM |