HI SB3155 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes the Task Force on Beach and Water Safety and the Risk Assessment Working Group. Requires the design and placement of warning signs, devices, and systems to be approved by the Chairperson of the Board of Land and Natural Resources for state beach parks and the county mayors for county beach parks.
Title
Relating To Public Land Liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2302) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2466 (Same As) 2024-02-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.