HI SB3158 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits intentionally or knowingly manufacturing, importing, installing, reinstalling, distributing, selling, or offering for sale any counterfeit supplemental restraint system component, nonfunctional air bag, or air bag that does not meet federal safety requirements, with the intent that such device replace an air bag in any air-bag-required motor vehicle. Prohibits intentionally or knowingly selling, offering for sale, installing, or reinstalling in an air-bag-required motor vehicle any device that causes the air-bag-required motor vehicle's diagnostic systems to fail to warn that an air bag is not installed or the air-bag-required motor vehicle is equipped with a counterfeit supplemental restraint system component or nonfunctional air bag, as applicable. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2020-07-10 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632). |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 07-10-20. |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 416). |
2020-07-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-07-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1266-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-06-30 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Say. |
2020-06-29 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 06-30-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 06-30-20. |
2020-06-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 49 |
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1112-20), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2020-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-13-20 10:15AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 512) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3129) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:00PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2758) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |