HI SB3187 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the tuition residency rules for the University of Hawaii to grant the resident tuition fee for enrollment at any University of Hawaii campus to individuals who have graduated from a Hawaii high school and are enrolling in an undergraduate degree program, under certain conditions.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Resident Tuition Fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2498 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to HRE, WAM.