HI SB3261 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Local Agriculture Transportation Cost Reimbursement Program to reimburse eligible ranchers and farmers a portion of their costs to transport livestock, livestock products, agricultural commodities, and certain supplies under certain circumstances. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2541) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:31PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |