HI SB330 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act 155, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1257).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Human Services to implement an earned income disregard program as an intermediate step to implementing a medicaid buy-in program. Requires reports to the legislature. Takes effect upon approval by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To An Earned Income Disregard Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01SenateAct 155, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1257).
2019-07-01HouseAct 155, on 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1257).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 67) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 67).
2019-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2019-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Ihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 2:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-19 2:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-19 2:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903).
2019-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Ihara, L. Thielen, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Kitagawa, Ward.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 541).
2019-04-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1973), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1678) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say.
2019-03-20HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-21-19 10:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-03-20HouseThe committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-19 at 10:00am.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Wednesday, 03-20-19 8:45AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 98) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 701) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 103) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to HMS, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback