HI SB336 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB336
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts any county from disapproving or imposing certain conditions on a housing development project or an emergency shelter unless the county meets certain requirements. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 192) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB336 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.