HI SB356 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB356
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires homeowners insurers to provide written and oral disclosure to an insured regarding the natural disaster perils not covered by the insured's homeowners insurance policy.
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HOU, CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB356 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=356&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB356_.HTM |