HI SB357 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent Act 160, SLH 2010. Requires maintenance of public beach accesses by adjacent landowners and imposes penalties for noncompliance. Establishes shoreline access as an objective of the coastal zone management program. Requires the department of land and natural resources to provide written notice to property owners affected by Act 160, SLH 2010.
Title
Coastal Areas; Public Access
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL will hold a public decision making on 02-05-13 1:16PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-31-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB17 (Same As)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=357&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB357_.HTM |