HI SB357 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB357
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a terminally ill adult with the capacity to make an informed health care decision to request a prescription for aid in dying medication from their attending physician to facilitate a peaceful death. Establishes that an attending physician determines a terminally ill adult's capacity to make an informed health care decision. Establishes that medical aid in dying does not constitute euthanasia, suicide, homicide, elder abuse or neglect, or cause a person to be considered a danger to self. Protects physicians who assist patients in obtaining aid in dying medication from civil or criminal liability. Makes it a felony to coerce an individual to request medication for the purpose of ending his or her life or to conceal a rescission of such request.
Title
Relating To Aid In Dying.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB357 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to CPH, JDL.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=357&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB357_.HTM |