HI SB362 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB362
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the conveyance tax rate for certain properties. Exempts conveyances of certain real property from the conveyance tax. Establishes the homeless services fund. Eliminates the cap on the amount of conveyance tax collections allocated to the land conservation fund and rental housing revolving fund. Allocates ten percent of conveyance tax collections to the homeless services fund. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Conveyance Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1). |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1593) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-22 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 03-22-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN , referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 144) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1049) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB286 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB362 (Carry Over) 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
SB362 (Carry Over) 2023-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ilagan excused (1).
Subjects
Allocations
Conveyance Tax Rates and Exemptions
Homeless Services Fund
Land Conservation Fund
Rental Housing Revolving Fund
Conveyance Tax Rates and Exemptions
Homeless Services Fund
Land Conservation Fund
Rental Housing Revolving Fund