HI SB364 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a professional tour guide certification task force to determine whether it is appropriate to require persons who use various state resources for commercial purposes or apply for various commercial use permits to hold and maintain certification or meet certain minimum requirements, recommend existing certificates or certification programs that may be appropriate, and make recommendations and plans regarding any necessary certifications and certification renewals. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tourism.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 105) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1151) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman.
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM/CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 11:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-20SenateRe-Referred to EET/HRE/WTL, WAM/CPH.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee on CPH has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EET/HRE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 653) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
2019-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on EET/HRE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 3:00PM in conference room 414.
2019-02-04SenateRe-Referred to EET/HRE/WTL, CPH.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EET/HRE/WTL, WAM/CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1108 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, WLH, FIN, referral sheet 6

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback