HI SB365 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits issuance of a permit for a Type I residential care home with up to five residents within one thousand feet of another Type I or Type II adult residential care home, and allows for immediate revocation of a permit deceptively obtained. Requires that no Type II adult residential care home with six or more residents may be issued a permit by a county agency unless a public informational meeting is first held in the affected community.
Title
Adult Residential Care Homes; Permits; Public Informational Meetings
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HMS/TIA. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=365&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB365_.HTM |