HI SB365 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB365
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows public school students in grades kindergarten through 12 to decline participation in dissection, vivisection, and other procedures harmful to animals. Requires schools to make alternative educational projects available, and the board of education to develop rules and give notice to all schools.
Title
Relating To Student Informed Consent.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 269) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB365 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.