HI SB369 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Department of Public Safety from receiving any commission payment from telephone service providers based on inmate phone calls. Prohibits the Department of Public Safety from entering into or renewing any contract with any privately owned prison telephone communications provider.
Title
Relating To Telephone Services For Committed Persons.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-01 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB369 (Carry Over) 2023-02-01 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Contract
Correctional Facilities
Department of Public Safety
Inmate Phone Calls
Privately Owned Telephone Communications Providers
Correctional Facilities
Department of Public Safety
Inmate Phone Calls
Privately Owned Telephone Communications Providers
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=369&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB369_.HTM |