HI SB376 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB376
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a public school that has a career and technical education program to review all geographic exceptions applications and make a determination whether to allow students to enroll in career and technical education programs in schools outside the Department of Education service area in which the student resides. (SB376 HD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1537) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 18). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 804) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 67) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB376 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).