HI SB382 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Livestock Revitalization Program a grant program for qualified feed developers. Appropriates funds for the grant program, reimbursements to qualified producers for feed cost, and a survey of local feed ingredient sources. Appropriates funds for the Future Farmers of America program. (SB382 HD2)
Title
Qualified Feed Developer Grants; Livestock Revitalization Program; Local Feed Source Survey; Local Agriculture; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2016-04-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 3:40PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 3:40PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Cachola, Ward. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 510). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1625) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-30 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1192) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-03-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-25-15 11:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 122) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 708) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-15 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 441) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-10-15 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB508 (Same As) 2016-04-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).