HI SB405 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes the ten per cent ethanol by volume requirement for gasoline sold in Hawaii for use in motor vehicles. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Fuel; Gasoline; Ethanol; Ten Per Cent Requirement; Repeal
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 361) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) English, Hooser, Kokubun; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-17-09 2:45 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 4:00pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |