HI SB409 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies county zoning by allowing amortization or phasing out of nonconforming single-family transient vacation rentals over a reasonable period of time. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii State Association of Counties Package; Zoning; Single-family Transient Vacation Rentals
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 19) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-15. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Tokuda. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TSI. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB198 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.