HI SB427 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB427
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the exclusive jurisdiction of the small claims division of the district court over cases in which the amount claimed is $1,000 or less exclusive of interest and costs. Expands the small claims division's jurisdiction over personal property cases to include any personal property worth $5,000 or less.
Title
Relating To Small Claims Division Of The District Court.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB427 (Carry Over) 2017-02-22 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
HB1400 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
HB1400 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=427&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB427_.HTM |