HI SB427 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB427
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that the County of Kauai contract solely with the Kauai Humane Society for the provision of animal control services.
Title
Relating To Animal Control Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB427 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Re-Referred to JDC.
HB156 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Act 004, 04/14/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
HB156 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Act 004, 04/14/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=427&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB427_.HTM |