HI SB464 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 200, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 200, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons charging a consumer's credit or debit card or account for automatic renewal or continuous service offer to first obtain the consumer's affirmative consent. Requires acknowledgment of terms, cancellation policy, and information on how to cancel the automatic renewal or continuous service to be provided to the consumer. Requires free trial offers to clearly and conspicuously disclose how to cancel the agreement prior to the consumer being charged for goods and services. (CD1)
Title
Unfair and Deceptive Practices; Free Trial Offers; Automatic Renewals; Continuous Service Offers
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Act 200, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301). |
2015-07-06 | House | Act 200, on 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 18). |
2015-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, Brower; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Brower, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 515). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1623) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15 at 2:05 PM in room 325. |
2015-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-31-15 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-15. |
2015-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 135) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 578) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1219 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 016.