HI SB465 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a civil cause of action of physical or constructive invasion of privacy if the person obtains any type of visual image, sound recording, or other physical impression of another person under circumstances in which another person has a reasonable expectation of keeping private their personal life under certain conditions. Effective 07/01/50. (SD1)
Title
Tort Actions; Physical or Constructive Invasion of Privacy; Civil Cause of Action
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 140) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |