HI SB477 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the Department of Education to provide sexual abuse and sex trafficking prevention training to certain staff. Requires DOE to make available to certain staff explanatory information about protocols that DOE has approved for providing services to victims of sexual abuse and sex trafficking. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 149) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 915) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 448) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 3:30PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EDU, JDC/WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback