HI SB492 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an excise tax equal to $3.20 per ounce of tobacco in each article or item of tobacco products, other than large cigars. Allocates monies generated to certain special funds and the general fund. Effective July 1, 2013. (SB492 HD1)
Title
Tobacco Products; Excise Tax; Special Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-01-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from HLT/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1218) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Nakashima, Ohno, Takai, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Fale; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Takumi. |
2013-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HED on Wednesday, 03-20-13 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-11 | House | Re-referred to HLT/HED, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT/EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 145) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 778) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, English, L. Thielen, Tokuda. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-13 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 420) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-13 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB657 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Evans, Hanohano, Ing, McKelvey, Rhoads voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2).