HI SB494 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits family courts to award reasonable visitation to primary caregivers under certain circumstances, regardless of whether the child has been formally adopted by the caregiver under Hawaii law. Establishes presumption that a parent's decision regarding visitation is in the best interests of the child, which may be rebutted by clear and convincing evidence that denial would cause significant harm to the child. Identifies factors a court may consider in awarding visitation. Grants the court discretion to place reasonable restrictions, including time limitations, on visitation. (SD1)
Title
Child Visitation; Primary Caregiver Visitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 483) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HSH, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |