HI SB496 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of flavored tobacco products and the mislabeling of e-liquids as nicotine free. Authorizes the department of health to appoint, commission, or contract for services of inspectors. Establishes two full-time equivalent program specialist position and one full-time equivalent hearing officer position. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2024.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPN/HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB496 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPN/HHS, WAM.
HB551 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB551 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=496&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB496_.HTM |