HI SB497 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates matching funds for the environmental impact statement associated with the planned beach nourishment project at Kaanapali Beach on the island of Maui. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB497 HD1)
Title
Beach Nourishment; Beach Restoration Special Fund; Kaanapali Beach; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1028) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 147) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from THA/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 376) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Slom. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to THA/WTL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB378 (Same As) 2013-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:15PM in conference room 312.