HI SB505 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 187, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 187, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds support for mediation of condominium related disputes as one of the educational purposes supported by the condominium education trust fund. Beginning with the July 1, 2015, biennium registration, imposes an additional annual condominium education trust fund fee dedicated to supporting mediation of condominium related disputes. Specifies the total fee payable into the condominium education trust fund. Requires the real estate commission to make adjustments to the condominium education trust fund to ensure adequate funds are available for mediation of condominium related disputes and any mediation requests are fully accommodated prior to the commencement of the additional annual condominium education trust fund fee. (CD1)
Title
Condominiums; Condominium Education Trust Fund; Mediation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 187, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 187, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige. |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott, Ward voting no (3) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 38) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 38). |
2013-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nishimoto, Brower, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 4:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Espero added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Brower, Thielen. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria, Kouchi. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-11-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 440). |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Fukumoto, McDermott, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cabanilla excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1408), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Takayama. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1123) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Carroll, Har, Tsuji, McDermott. |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-13. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-14-13 5:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 152) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 794) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 157) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB24 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Referred to CPN, WAM.