HI SB507 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 188, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Act 188, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates notice requirements for regular annual meetings and special meetings of a planned community association. (CD1)
Title
Planned Community Associations; Notice Requirements; Regular and Special Meetings
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | Act 188, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291). |
2013-06-26 | House | Act 188, on 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291). |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cheape, Coffman, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Ito, Johanson, Kawakami, Lowen, Morikawa, Ohno, Takai, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamane voting no (17) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-26 | House | Deferred one day 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 747). |
2013-04-25 | House | Deferred one day 04-26-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Nishihara. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-25-13. |
2013-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04/25/13. |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 7) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 7). |
2013-04-19 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, McKelvey, Jordan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 11:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Jordan, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 528). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-03 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Evans, Har, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Ito. |
2013-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-13 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-13. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3). |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 965), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 03-11-13 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-02-15 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 25) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Solomon). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-15-13. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 251) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-06-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB475 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.