HI SB52 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 125, 6/15/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 125, 6/15/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons convicted of violation of privacy in the first degree and all persons convicted of promoting prostitution in the first degree to register as sex offenders. Applies retroactively. (CD1)
Title
Sex Offender Registration; Violation of Privacy
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | (S) Act 125, 6/15/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228). | |
2011-06-16 | (H) Act 125, on 6/15/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1228). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 105) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 105). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Choy, Brower, Luke, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 8:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 3:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-11 10:30AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 656). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Rhoads replaced Representative(s) Keith-Agaran as Co-Chairs. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Rhoads. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran, Choy Co-Chairs; Brower, Luke, Rhoads, Thielen. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 416). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1576), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Har excused (2). | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1047) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-17-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 66) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 616) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. | |
2011-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-11 3:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-04-11 12:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-04-11 12:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |