HI SB533 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the news media, under the supervision of emergency management agency personnel, to access areas that are closed pursuant to emergency management powers of the governor and mayor. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Emergency Management; News Media Access
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 32) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 592) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-18-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 74) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB592 (Same As) 2015-02-05 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.