HI SB535 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB535
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance policies and contracts issued after 12/31/18 to provide coverage for the cost of hearing aids at a minimum of $1,500 per hearing aid for each hearing-impaired ear every thirty-six months. Takes effect on 6/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Hearing Aids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 194) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 218) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB535 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB613 (Same As) 2017-01-25 - Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, referral sheet 3
HB613 (Same As) 2017-01-25 - Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, referral sheet 3