HI SB536 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB536
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HMS/CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HMS/CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the use of the public utilities commission's universal service fund to provide free telecommunications access to information for individuals with print disabilities.
Title
Relating To Telecommunications Access For Individuals With Print Disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPN, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB536 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HMS/CPN, WAM.
HB837 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB837 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=536&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB536_.HTM |