HI SB540 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the board of pharmacy to approve pilot and demonstration projects for innovative applications in the practice of pharmacy under certain conditions. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Board Of Pharmacy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 139) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 139).
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Takumi, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Har, Ward.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 665).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2073), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1593), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Har, Mizuno.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2019-03-14HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1308) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-12HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 178) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB75 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback