HI SB541 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a condominium hotel developer's public report to disclose past years' general excise taxes and transient accommodations taxes for converted condominium hotels. Requires that each condominium hotel operator file an annual report with the real estate commission.
Title
Condominium Conversions; Condominium Hotel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB571 (Same As) 2015-02-18 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=541&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB541_.HTM |