HI SB558 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB558
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HTH/LCA, CPN.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HTH/LCA, CPN.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes overtime limitations for nurses, nurse aides, and respiratory therapists. Takes effect 1/1/2022.
Title
Relating To Work Hours.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HTH/LCA, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB558 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HTH/LCA, CPN.
HB806 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT/HHH, CPC, referral sheet 1
HB806 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT/HHH, CPC, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=558&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB558_.HTM |