HI SB560 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii to translate the Hawaii State Constitution into the Hawaiian language. (SB560 HD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaiian Language.
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:02PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4). |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1110) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-13 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to OMH, HED, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 200) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 856) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HWN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 402) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Taniguchi. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Kim. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HRE has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HRE, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB560 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
HB1303 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to OMH, HED, FIN, referral sheet 6
HB1303 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to OMH, HED, FIN, referral sheet 6