HI SB576 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB576
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires licensed used motor vehicle part dealers to obtain a written statement by a seller of a catalytic converter that the seller has the lawful right to sell and dispose of the catalytic converter. Requires a seller of a catalytic converter to present a receipt or notarized declaration regarding the catalytic converter. Prohibits a licensed used motor vehicle part dealer from purchasing a catalytic converter with no receipt or notarized declaration and to report the attempted sale to the police. Establishes the offense of theft of catalytic converter as a class C felony. Takes effect 5/6/2137. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Used Motor Vehicle Parts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-15 | House | Re-referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 232) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 934) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-03-21 10:25AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 112) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB576 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Re-referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 25