HI SB603 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB603
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-10 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows students who experienced educational disruption to graduate high school through enrollment in an accepted alternative education program and participation in certain activities approved by the department of education.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB603 (Carry Over) 2023-02-10 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
HB658 (Same As) 2023-02-07 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB658 (Same As) 2023-02-07 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=603&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB603_.HTM |