HI SB620 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB620
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 11:00AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 11:00AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires retailers or vendors that are not located in the State and not required to pay or collect general excise or use tax for sales to send certain information to purchasers in the State. Allows the Director of Taxation to require retailers or vendors to submit an annual report to the Department of Taxation. Exempts retailers or vendors who voluntarily collect and pay use tax to the Department of Taxation. Prohibits the Department of Taxation from fining, charging interest on, or penalizing in any way a purchaser who receives notification and does not pay the use tax. Amends the definition of business under Hawaii's general excise tax law. (SB620 HD2)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 11:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Kidani. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Choy, Cullen, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 563). |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto, McDermott, McKelvey, Ohno, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1754) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-31 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1314) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 212) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 658) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 221) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB620 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 11:00AM in conference room 016.
HB345 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB345 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.