HI SB623 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB623
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes the requirement for unanimous agreement on state building code amendment recommendations by the four council members representing county building officials.
Title
Relating To The State Building Code Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB623 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=623&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB623_.HTM |